Class Notes
River Campus Undergraduate: 1960s
Reunion News
College of Arts, Sciences, and Engineering classes celebrating reunions
October 6–8, 2006
Slater Society: All post-50th Reunion Classes
65th Reunion: 1941
60th Reunion: 1946
55th Reunion: 1951
50th Reunion: 1956
45th Reunion: 1961
40th Reunion: 1966
35th Reunion: 1971
30th Reunion: 1976
25th Reunion: 1981
20th Reunion: 1986
15th Reunion: 1991
10th Reunion: 1996
5th Reunion: 2001
More about Meliora Weekend
1960
Maureen McGuigan Baldwin W (see ’58). .
. . Cynthia Crosby and James Myers were married
on May 28 in Knoxville, Tenn. Cynthia is a retired Syracuse school administrator.
1961
Ronald Karpick writes, “June was a good
month for me. I attended my 40th reunion at Yale Medical School, and many of
my Rochester classmates were there. Carl Ellenberger
is still actively practicing neurology with an interest in imaging, and he continues
his love of music. (Carl is a flutist with Gretna Music in Pennsylvania, an
organization he founded 30 years ago. He also is a member of the artistic committee.)
Carl Hunt is director of the National Institutes
of Health’s National Center on Sleep Disorders Research. Larry
Ossias still has an active hematology and internal medicine practice.
I am the tuberculosis consultant for the Fairfax County Health Department in
Virginia, which I joined in 2003 after 30 years of pulmonary and critical-care
practice in Alexandria. On June 21, I received the fifth annual Tuberculosis
Recognition Award from the American Lung Association of Virginia for my work
on a disease that doesn’t want to go away.”
1963
Christopher (Kit) Eckel S is vice president of
human resources for Potlatch Corp. He also is a member of the company’s
management committee. Kit has been with Potlatch since 1978. . . . Ray
Riek writes, “I am shutting down my product development consulting
business to accept the position of COO for Delta-Energy. This startup company
concentrates on the recovery of raw materials from petroleum-based products.
Delta’s first business is in the depolymerization of scrap tires, recovering
high-value reinforcing materials, oil, and gas, and is building a major facility
in the Midwest.” . . . Bob Yanover writes,
“I recently moved to Napa, Calif., and am still selling electronic document
imaging systems for L. R. Hines Consulting. I am also a baseball umpire, mostly
for high school and adult leagues, and I referee club-level soccer and basketball.
The highlight of my umpire career happened last June 27, when I was crew chief
and plate umpire for a nine-inning adult-league game at Pac Bell Park, home
of the San Francisco Giants! My regards to all my friends who attended Rochester
in the 1960s.”
1964
Carnie Littlefield writes, “I passed the
20-year milestone with the IRS in various capacities as a computer specialist.
I also have been an adjunct faculty member in computer science for more than
12 years at Austin Community College and St. Edward’s University in Austin,
Texas, where I have lived for 22 years. I have been married for 29 years to
the love of my life, Kiki; we have three sons, John, 37, Brian, 36, and Carnie,
24.”
1966
Harrington (Kit) Crissey writes, “Christopher
Weait and I had an article, ‘Chamber Wind Music for Double Reeds by Eastman
School of Music Composers,’ published in The Double Reed, the
quarterly journal of the International Double Reed Society. Christopher taught
bassoon at the Eastman School for a year while David Van Hoesen was on sabbatical.”
. . . Robert Klimasewski ’67 (Mas) was appointed
interim CEO of VirtualScopics, a medical image analysis company that evolved
from research carried out at the Medical Center and the School of Engineering
and Applied Sciences. Robert also is a member of the company’s board of
directors.
1967
Kate Stuart Cooper ’68W (Mas) writes, “I
am a member of the Merrimack Valley Chorus in Wilmington, Mass., which placed
fourth in the small-chorus division at the Harmony Classic Sweet Adelines International
Competition in Greenville, S.C., last July.” . . . Susan
Pfleeger Harkness received her law degree from the University at Buffalo
Law School last May. “Going to law school was a great experience, but
I’m pretty sure this will be my last degree!” she writes. Susan
planned to move to North Carolina after her daughter’s wedding in August.
. . . Elaine Emerson Hilton (see ’95). .
. . George Ritter was appointed chief medical
officer of SafeCare Systems Group in Chantilly, Va. Previously, George was medical
director of patient safety at Baystate Medical Center’s division of healthcare
quality in Springfield, Mass. . . . Suzanne Timble was
appointed managing director and senior trust officer of Private Bank and Trust
in Winnetka, Ill.
1968
Stephen Rush was appointed to the board of directors
of Transac Enterprise Corp. Stephen is an adjunct professor in the graduate
business school at Golden Gate University.
1969
Rep. Ruth Balser has been named chair of the Joint
Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse in the Massachusetts State Legislature.
. . . President Bush has nominated Donald Winter
to be the next Navy secretary. Donald was a corporate vice president at Northrop
Grumman and president of the company’s mission systems sector when he
was nominated for the Navy post.
|