Class Notes
River Campus Undergraduate: 1970s
Reunion News
College of Arts, Sciences, and Engineering classes celebrating reunions
October 6–8, 2006
Slater Society: All post-50th Reunion Classes
65th Reunion: 1941
60th Reunion: 1946
55th Reunion: 1951
50th Reunion: 1956
45th Reunion: 1961
40th Reunion: 1966
35th Reunion: 1971
30th Reunion: 1976
25th Reunion: 1981
20th Reunion: 1986
15th Reunion: 1991
10th Reunion: 1996
5th Reunion: 2001
More about Meliora Weekend
1970
Christine Montgomery Van Stean ’84W (Mas)
retired from the University after 37 years. She writes, “I started in
the River Campus Libraries in 1968 and spent nearly half my time in the Chemistry/Carlson
Library. I moved to human resources in 1985 and most recently was an organization
development specialist, teaching classes and facilitating department interventions.”
1973
Carolyn Holop Coleman (see ’74). . . . Terence
Keane, professor of psychiatry and psychology at Boston University, received
two career achievement awards for his work on posttraumatic stress disorder.
He was given the International Society for Traumatic Stress Studies’ lifetime
achievement award, and he was named outstanding researcher in behavior therapy
by the Association for Advancement of Behavior Therapy. Terence is the associate
chief of staff for research and director of the National Center for PTSD at
V.A. Boston Healthcare System. . . . Jeremy Seligman
’84S (MBA) is director of I.T. strategy and organizational development
for the Ford Motor Company. Previously, Jeremy was manager of I.T. strategy
and competency development at Ford.
1974
Bob Katz hosted a minireunion at his home in Aptos,
Calif., this year. Bob writes, “Rochester alumni attending the three days
of festivities were Carolyn Holop Coleman ’73,
Steve Martin, Sumiko Kawamura Kelmelis ’77,
Bennett Keiser ’75, Rebecca
Kantor Martin ’75, Reed Martin ’75,
Steve Taffet, Jim Buika, Gerald Feldman, and Mitch
Miller ’76.”
1975
Bennett Keiser (see ’74). . . . Reed
and Rebecca Kantor Martin (see ’74). . .
. Gary Mittleman ’77 (Mas) has been named
to the board of directors of IPLogic, a business communications company. Gary
is the former CEO of Plug Power. . . . Christopher Mugel
has joined the Richmond, Va., office of Kaufman & Canoles, where he is cochair
of the firm’s intellectual property and technology group. He currently
is chair of the intellectual property section of the Virginia State Bar. A 2004
survey of lawyers conducted by Virginia Business magazine voted Christopher
the leading intellectual property attorney in Virginia. . . . Judith
Silver, associate director of the Leadership Education in Neurodevelopmental
Disabilities Program at the Children’s Hospital of Philadelphia, was chosen
as a fellow of the “Leaders for the 21st Century” program, a leadership
development initiative offered by Zero to Three, a national nonprofit organization
that studies children’s early development. Judith is codirector of Safe
Place: The Center for Child Protection and Health.
1976
Michael Goldman was appointed chair of the biology
department at San Francisco State University. . . . John
Mezger, a real estate developer, was named to the board of trustees of
the Dividend Capital Realty Income Allocation Fund in Denver, Colo. . . . Mitch
Miller (see ’74).
1977
Sumiko Kawamura Kelmelis (see ’74).
1978
George Mokrzan, a senior economist at Huntington
Bancshares, was named to the American Bankers Association Economic Advisory
Committee, which meets with the Federal Reserve governors and the President’s
Council of Economic Advisors.
1979
Dawne Sepanski Hickton is senior vice president
of administration and chief administrative officer for RTI International Metals.
. . . Paul Oestreicher is the United States director
of the health and pharmaceutical practice at WPP Group’s Hill & Knowlton.
. . . Andrew Sommers was appointed a Colonie,
N.Y., town court judge last April. Andrew, a partner in the Albany law firm
Sommers & Sommers, planned to run for election in the fall. He writes, “It’s
my first since running for student senate (and winning) in the late 1970s! I’ve
been married to my wife, Susan, for 19 years. We have a son, Sam, 15, in 10th
grade, and daughter, Daryl, 17, in college.”
|