Class Notes
River Campus Undergraduate: 1970s
Reunion News
College of Arts, Sciences, and Engineering classes celebrating reunions
October 6–8, 2006
Slater Society: All post-50th Reunion Classes
65th Reunion: 1941
60th Reunion: 1946
55th Reunion: 1951
50th Reunion: 1956
45th Reunion: 1961
40th Reunion: 1966
35th Reunion: 1971
30th Reunion: 1976
25th Reunion: 1981
20th Reunion: 1986
15th Reunion: 1991
10th Reunion: 1996
5th Reunion: 2001
More about Meliora Weekend
1970
Steven Chu, a member of the University’s
Board of Trustees and physics professor at Stanford University, was named director
of the Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory in Berkeley, Calif. . . . Gerald
Itkin writes that he has retired for the second time in 12 months, this
time from his job as a prosecutor in Key West, Fla. “A final one-year
stint following a 14-year hiatus qualified me for this latest milestone,”
he says. He retired as deputy county attorney for Multnomah County in Oregon
in 2003. Gerald is now working part time as a consultant and continues to lead
trips to various locations around the world. He plans to lead groups bicycling
in Ireland and climbing Mt. Kilimanjaro in 2005. “Anyone interested in
either of these trips, or travel opportunities in general, can contact me at
(503) 233-1514 or traveler (at) itkin (dot) net.” . . . Andrew
Kohn is serving a one-year term as president of the professional trade
organization American Prepaid Legal Services Institute.
1971
Kenneth Shore was named School Psychologist of
the Year by the New Jersey Association of School Psychologists. He has retired
from his position as school psychologist at Steinert High School in Hamilton,
N.J.
1972
Susan Bass Levin is New Jersey’s first “smart
growth ombudsman.” She was mayor of Cherry Hill, N.J., where she lives,
for 14 years.
1973
Alan Cohen writes, “I have been at Boston
University for 10 years as a professor of health policy and management in the
School of Management and for nine years (until summer 2003) was the director
of the Health Care M.B.A. program. In September 2003, I was appointed executive
director of the Boston University Health Policy Institute, and last April I
was appointed professor of health services in the School of Public Health, In
addition, I am the author of Technology in American Health Care.”
. . . Lester Ezrati writes, “My first grandchild
arrived March 9.” . . . Steve Gilbert ’86M
(PhD) is the author of A Small Dose of Toxicology: Health Effects of Common
Chemicals. Steve is director of the Institute of Neurotoxicology and Neurological
Disorders in Seattle, Wash. . . . Sue Griffey ’73N
remarried in 2003. She and her husband, John Oetting, a satellite communications
scientist at Johns Hopkins Applied Physics Lab, moved to Columbia, Md. Sue is
vice president for technical operations at JHPIEGO, a not-for-profit international
public health organization affiliated with Johns Hopkins University. She designed
and teaches a course for United States–based health professionals who
want to do international development work. Sue says, “I continue to travel
overseas for work and enjoy connecting and reconnecting with old friends from
all the places I’ve lived during my years as an expatriate, but I love
being in the same place for more than two to three years at a time.” .
. . Steven Wasserman has been appointed assistant
dean for research at the University of Virginia School of Medicine.
1974
William Newell, assistant director of Syracuse
University’s Project Advance, was a guest speaker at the Dual Enrollment
Administrative Luncheon, sponsored by Lehigh Carbon Community College in Schnecksville,
Pa., last summer. Project Advance offers high school seniors concurrent enrollment
at Syracuse.
1975
James Craigie is president and CEO of Church
& Dwight, a manufacturer of personal care products. He is also on the board
of directors for the company. . . . Adele Fico’s
one-woman show, May God Strike Me Dead . . . (If I’m Telling a Lie)!,
was staged at the Blackfriars Theatre in Rochester last July. . . . Jane
Weintraub and Chris Barker ’76 celebrated
their third wedding anniversary this year. Jane, Lee Hysan Professor and chair
of the oral epidemiology division at the University of California’s San
Francisco School of Dentistry, is president of the American Association of Public
Health Dentistry. Chris is the director of the genomics core laboratory at the
J. David Gladstone Institutes and the General Clinical Research Center at San
Francisco General Hospital.
1976
Chris Barker (see ’75). . . . Bill
Furdon is principal of Pearl River (N.Y.) High School. . . . Ira
Kaplan was named an “Ohio Super Lawyer”—a top attorney
in his field—for 2004, by a panel of lawyers. Ira is a partner with Benesch,
Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff in Cleveland.
1977
Blair Wimbush was named vice president of real
estate for the Norfolk (Va.) Southern Corporation last June. Previously, he
was senior general counsel for the company.
1978
Neal Miller (see ’79). . . . Marine Col.
David Wunder returned from Afghanistan and is
now the staff judge advocate at the Marine Corps base in Camp Lejeune, N.C.
He writes, “I’d like to hear from fellow classmates. My e-mail address
is davidwunder (at) justice (dot) com.”
1979
Steve Paluszek writes, “In the ‘it’s
a small world’ category, Neal Miller ’78,
Carl Bonner ’96 (PhD), and I, all living
in the Hampton Roads, Va., area, found ourselves on the same soccer team, competing
in a tournament in Charleston, S.C., on Memorial Day weekend.”
|